|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1948 | 17/11/1948 | 27 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60530 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1949 | 28/04/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1949 | 31/05/1949 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1949 | 09/12/1949 | 33 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1951 | 08/06/1951 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/06/1952 | 18/06/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1953 | 08/05/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1954 | 26/02/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29868 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1955 | 22/09/1955 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 29814 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1958 | 19/09/1958 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29853 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1959 | 11/02/1959 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1959 | 19/03/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1960 | 21/07/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29874 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1962 | 17/05/1962 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29879 (Diagram 118) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/03/1964 | 1 day | Special | Axle test |
|||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1964 | 08/10/1964 | 38 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Southern Area | 'A.2' No. E530 Sayajirao (KX) arrived in London on 11/3 and went on the running-in turn to Cambridge next day. No. E531 Bahram had commenced running-in by then and 532 was in the Paint Shop. | SLS/194805 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Main Erecting shop) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 530, name: SAYAJIRAO Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2021 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
22/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1948. Dep: 17/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60530 |
||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
26/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/04/1949. Dep: 28/04/1949. | ||
30/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/05/1949. Dep: 31/05/1949. | ||
07/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 09/12/1949. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
09/12/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
09/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
07/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/05/1951. Dep: 08/06/1951. | ||
16/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1952. Dep: 18/06/1952. | ||
31/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 08/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1954. Dep: 26/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29868 (Diagram 118) |
||
25/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 22/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29814 (Diagram 118) |
||
05/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
30/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1958. Dep: 19/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29853 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1959. Dep: 11/02/1959. | ||
14/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1959. Dep: 19/03/1959. | ||
07/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1960. Dep: 21/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29874 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1962. Dep: 17/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29879 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
16/03/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Special) - Arr: 16/03/1964. Work undertaken: Axle test |
||
31/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
01/09/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1964. Dep: 08/10/1964. | ||
19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60530 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |