|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1920 | 09/1920 | General | Superheater boiler fitted Boiler number G923 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1923 | 08/12/1923 | 96 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1926 | 29/07/1926 | 137 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/02/1928 | 10/05/1928 | 72 days | General | Boiler number D2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1929 | 08/01/1930 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1933 | 18/09/1933 | 35 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1936 | 20/03/1936 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2379 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1939 | 17/10/1939 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1941 | 31/10/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2381 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1944 | 02/03/1944 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1946 | 07/05/1946 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1948 | 02/07/1948 | 46 days | General | Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 3893 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69788 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1951 | 12/04/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24699 (Diagram 63BSup) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1953 | 16/05/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24766 (Diagram 63B) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1193 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Starbeck (SBK) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/09/1920. Work undertaken: Superheater boiler fitted Boiler number G923 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
04/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1923. Dep: 08/12/1923. | ||
15/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1926. Dep: 29/07/1926. | ||
29/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1928. Dep: 10/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
18/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1929. Dep: 08/01/1930. | ||
15/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1933. Dep: 18/09/1933. | ||
04/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1936. Dep: 20/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2379 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
29/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1939. Dep: 17/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
30/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1941. Dep: 31/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2381 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
01/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1944. Dep: 02/03/1944. | ||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 07/05/1946. | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9788 | ||
28/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
18/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1948. Dep: 02/07/1948. Work undertaken: Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 3893 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69788 |
||
06/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1951. Dep: 12/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24699 (Diagram 63BSup) |
||
17/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24766 (Diagram 63B) |
||
16/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/11/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69788 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
12/1955 | Scrapped | Scrapped |