|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1919 | 05/1919 | General | Boiler number G927 (Diagram 55Sat) |
|||
Darlington Works | 1922 | 03/1922 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G942 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1924 | 07/02/1925 | 95 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1927 | 13/07/1927 | 106 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1928 | 15/01/1929 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1930 | 03/04/1930 | 67 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1933 | 15/06/1933 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1935 | 09/01/1936 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1940 | 28/07/1940 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1943 | 13/02/1943 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2198 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2495 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1948 | 21/05/1948 | 42 days | General | Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 24711 (Diagram 63B) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69784 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1948 | 23/02/1949 | 90 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/05/1950 | 14/06/1950 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1951 | 23/02/1951 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1951 | 04/05/1951 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1951 | 09/08/1951 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1953 | 30/11/1953 | 33 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1185 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Starbeck (SBK) Diagram 55Sup boiler fitted |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/05/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number G927 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/03/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G942 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
05/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925. | ||
30/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1927. Dep: 13/07/1927. | ||
30/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1928. Dep: 15/01/1929. | ||
27/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1930. Dep: 03/04/1930. | ||
23/02/1931 | Modification | Diagram 55Sup number 2380 boiler fitted | ||
01/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1933. Dep: 15/06/1933. | ||
14/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1935. Dep: 09/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
27/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1940. Dep: 28/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
06/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2198 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
28/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2495 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
17/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9784 | ||
10/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948. Work undertaken: Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 24711 (Diagram 63B) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69784 |
||
26/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1948. Dep: 23/02/1949. | ||
02/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950. | ||
05/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951. | ||
04/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1951. Dep: 04/05/1951. | ||
13/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/07/1951. Dep: 09/08/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
29/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1953. Dep: 30/11/1953. | ||
03/1956 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
05/03/1956 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69784 from Hull Springhead (53C) |