|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/09/1922 | 17/01/1923 | 134 days | General | Boiler number G952 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1924 | 13/06/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1926 | 30/07/1926 | 121 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1928 | 30/11/1928 | 45 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1930 | 31/12/1930 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1933 | 26/04/1933 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D2048 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1935 | 11/05/1935 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2198 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1942 | 03/12/1942 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1944 | 29/09/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2200 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1946 | 07/06/1946 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D2048 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 3365 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69783 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1949 | 15/11/1949 | 51 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1951 | 29/03/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24706 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1951 | 06/04/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1954 | 30/01/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24699 (Diagram 63BSup) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1954 | 02/02/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1956 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/11/1953 | Darlington Works | North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. | SLS/195402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1183 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
06/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1922. Dep: 17/01/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number G952 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
06/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1924. Dep: 13/06/1924. | ||
20/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
01/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1926. Dep: 30/07/1926. | ||
17/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1928. Dep: 30/11/1928. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
10/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930. | ||
09/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1933. Dep: 26/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2048 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
02/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
25/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2198 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
30/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1942. Dep: 03/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
05/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 29/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2200 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9783 | ||
14/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2048 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
28/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 3365 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69783 |
||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 15/11/1949. | ||
27/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1951. Dep: 29/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24706 (Diagram 63B) |
||
02/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1951. Dep: 06/04/1951. | ||
26/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
05/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 30/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24699 (Diagram 63BSup) |
||
01/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1954. Dep: 02/02/1954. | ||
17/12/1956 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69783 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
17/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/12/1956. | ||
04/1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped |