|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1917 | 10/1917 | General | Boiler number G943 (Diagram 55Sat) |
|||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1924 | 16/09/1924 | 106 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G920 (Diagram 55Sat) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1926 | 15/09/1926 | 136 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1928 | 21/11/1928 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1931 | 17/08/1931 | 55 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1934 | 16/05/1934 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1937 | 12/03/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2495 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1940 | 21/05/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1940 | 28/08/1940 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1942 | 21/11/1942 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1946 | 29/06/1946 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1948 | 10/06/1948 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69771 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1950 | 16/11/1950 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1952 | 01/02/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24731 (Diagram 63BSup) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1952 | 20/02/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1952 | 04/03/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/10/1954 | York Area | October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C. 69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November. 67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains. 73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days. |
SLS/195412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1910 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1114 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Thirsk (TSK) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/10/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number G943 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
10/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
03/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1924. Dep: 16/09/1924. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G920 (Diagram 55Sat) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
03/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1926. Dep: 15/09/1926. | ||
02/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1928. Dep: 21/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
24/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1931. Dep: 17/08/1931. | ||
10/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1934. Dep: 16/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
09/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1937. Dep: 12/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2495 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
14/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
23/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1940. Dep: 21/05/1940. | ||
06/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
31/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1940. Dep: 28/08/1940. | ||
28/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942. | ||
14/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
10/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9771 | ||
03/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. | ||
06/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1948. Dep: 10/06/1948. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69771 |
||
12/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
11/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1950. Dep: 16/11/1950. | ||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 01/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24731 (Diagram 63BSup) |
||
12/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/02/1952. Dep: 20/02/1952. | ||
25/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1952. Dep: 04/03/1952. | ||
03/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
08/11/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69771 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
01/1955 | Scrapped | Scrapped |