|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1938 | 22/09/1938 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1938 | 20/12/1938 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1939 | 15/07/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1940 | 27/11/1940 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1941 | 29/04/1941 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 8961 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender De-named CAPERCAILLIE Named CHARLES H NEWTON |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1942 | 29/08/1942 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1942 | 10/09/1942 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1943 | 11/06/1943 | 16 days | Light Repair | De-named CHARLES H NEWTON Named SIR CHARLES NEWTON |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1943 | 12/09/1943 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1943 | 06/11/1943 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1944 | 02/02/1945 | 52 days | General | Middle cylinder fractured |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 53 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 5 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1947 | 25/01/1947 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1947 | 28/01/1948 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 9021 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1948 | 09/07/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60005 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1949 | 23/11/1949 | 45 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1951 | 11/06/1951 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29290 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1952 | 19/03/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1952 | 11/11/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29304 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1954 | 16/03/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1955 | 01/09/1955 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 29284 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1956 | 31/08/1956 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1957 | 04/05/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1958 | 10/12/1958 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29278 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1959 | 11/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1960 | 14/07/1960 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 29312 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1962 | 08/06/1962 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1962 | 02/11/1962 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 29334 (Diagram 107) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/05/1938 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5641 | ||
08/06/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4901, name: CAPERCAILLIE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1875 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
17/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1938. Dep: 22/09/1938. | ||
12/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1938. Dep: 20/12/1938. | ||
03/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939. | ||
11/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1940. Dep: 27/11/1940. | ||
17/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1941. Dep: 29/04/1941. | ||
14/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8961 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender De-named CAPERCAILLIE Named CHARLES H NEWTON |
||
22/08/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
26/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942. | ||
10/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1942. Dep: 10/09/1942. | ||
27/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1943. Dep: 11/06/1943. Work undertaken: De-named CHARLES H NEWTON Named SIR CHARLES NEWTON |
||
23/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1943. Dep: 12/09/1943. | ||
15/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1943. Dep: 06/11/1943. | ||
05/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. | ||
13/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1944. Dep: 02/02/1945. Work undertaken: Middle cylinder fractured |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 611 but not taken up | ||
12/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 5 |
||
15/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947. | ||
26/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1947. Dep: 28/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9021 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
17/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 09/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60005 |
||
10/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1949. Dep: 23/11/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
23/11/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
08/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1951. Dep: 11/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29290 (Diagram 107) |
||
05/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1952. Dep: 19/03/1952. | ||
06/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 11/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29304 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
11/11/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
08/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1954. Dep: 16/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 107) |
||
10/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1955. Dep: 01/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29284 (Diagram 107) |
||
30/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1956. Dep: 31/08/1956. | ||
25/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
21/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957. | ||
23/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1958. Dep: 10/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29278 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 11/03/1959. | ||
17/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1960. Dep: 14/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29312 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
08/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1962. Dep: 08/06/1962. | ||
15/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29334 (Diagram 107) |
||
28/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
10/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
12/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60005 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |