|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1937 | 11/12/1937 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 29 days | General | Larger coal space provided |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1939 | 29/07/1939 | 43 days | General | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1940 | 09/11/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 9129 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1942 | 21/03/1942 | 50 days | General | Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/02/1943 | 12/02/1943 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 43 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1946 | 09/02/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9128 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1947 | 21/02/1947 | 39 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1948 | 05/05/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8957 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5636 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. Renumbered to BR 60009 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1948 | 14/05/1948 | 1 day | Special | Tender change Tender number 5591 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1948 | 25/06/1948 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1948 | 03/12/1948 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1949 | 04/08/1949 | 50 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1950 | 23/11/1950 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1952 | 02/10/1952 | 43 days | General | Long guard irons removed Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 16/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1954 | 22/04/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29285 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1955 | 17/06/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29278 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1956 | 04/09/1956 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1957 | 05/04/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1958 | 18/11/1958 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1960 | 17/02/1960 | 37 days | General | AWS and speed indicator fitted Boiler number 27965 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1961 | 19/07/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27961 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1962 | 16/08/1962 | 71 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1963 | 06/11/1963 | 114 days | General | Boiler number 29337 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5332 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 05/12/1963 | 05/12/1963 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1964 | 18/04/1964 | 74 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
30/06/1950 | Capitals Limited | The 'Capitals Limited': No. 60009 Union of South Africa, one of the seven 'A.4' allocated to Haymarket (Scottish Region), was noted continuously for the first 3½ weeks of the summer service on this train on its northbound non-stop run, also making the through 392-mile run in one or other direction on the Sundays: the alternate turns were operated by King's Cross 'A.4,' two of which were used in turn. | SLS/195008 |
31/08/1950 | East coast route | Six hours' observation on a Saturday in August, 1950, showed that the 'V.2's' were taking a big share in express workings, no less than seventeen being noted: some worked through to London from Newcastle or York, for instance, on the 'Northumbrian' and the 'Scarborough Flier': Thirteen 'A.1' Pacifics were also seen, many now named and in blue livery; while 'A.2,' 'A.3,' and 'A.4' classes were in evidence to a much less extent. At the beginning of the season, the 'Capitals Limited' was run for 4½ weeks continuously by the 'A.4,' 60009 Union of South Africa (Haymarket); while during July and August another Haymarket engine, 60031 Golden Plover excelled this by 5½ weeks' continuous running, including Sundays when a Newcastle stop is included. Owing to a mishap to the 'A.4' hauling the 'Flying Scotsman' at Knebworth recently, the train was brought on to London by a 'B.1,' the train-name headboard being transferred to the emergency locomotive. On another occasion an 'Al' was in difficulty at Potter's Bar with the 'Northumbrian,' when an 'N.2' brought the train on-bunker first-sporting the special headboard. | SLS/195010 |
29/06/1953 | Elizabethan Express | The first 'Elizabethan' from London was in charge of A4 60028 and Driver J. Howard, and both arrived on time and intact at Edinburgh despite the combined efforts of the reporters and television cameras. Up to quite a late hour it was hoped that 60022 would be able to do the trip but several failures of minor and major importance had made the prospect unlikely, then a final test a day or two beforehand still showed a tendency for one of the motion pins to run warm, and so 60028, fairly new ex works, was quickly made ready. So far, the first month has produced only one failure; a trailing bogie on 60008 ran hot (on Monday the 13th) on her first down run, and at Dunbar a D49 took over for the short run to Edinburgh. One of the Haymarket locos., No. 60009 was suspected of being a little warm on arrival at Kings Cross, during the second week, and 60028 was sent in its place the next morning (60017 had previously taken over the Kings X working leaving 60028 in reserve), 60009 returned on its right working later. This loco. had earlier worked the first Up train, a run spoilt by a piece of cotton waste blocking the water pick-up, causing a stop at Retford for a. 'drink.' Good work by Driver Smith thereafter reduced the late arrival to only five or six minutes. 60004 has performed well from the Edinburgh end (though reported a little weak at the front end), with some help from 60031. | SLS/195310 |
01/10/1953 | A4 Corrections | We have received from a member who wishes to remain anonymous the following rectifications to the notes on A4 failures recently: No. 60008 ran hot at Dunbar with a carrying box hot, not a bogie box. The offending cotton waste on No. 60009 on the first day of The Elizabethan blew into the rachet of the scoop while it was being lowered, jamming the scoop temporarily, and by the time it was freed the troughs were passed; there was no blockage. No A4 has a pony truck; L.M.S. and B.R. Pacifics have pony trucks, but L.N.E.R. Pacifics have carrying axles in Cartazzi boxes. | SLS/195401 |
28/06/1954 | G.N. notes | With the Summer Service proper, starting on 28th June, interest is again focussed on the 'Elizabethan,' accelerated this year to a 6½-hour schedule. This year it was decided to keep two A4's specially for this job, one to work the train and the other as stand-by. The system previously adopted, of letting the men take their own loco. on this train, has been dropped, presumably because of the extra labour and worry involved in seeing that nine different engines are brought to and maintained in a good enough condition to do the non-stop run just for one week only in each case. Some of the regular engines have got in good mileages (over 80,000 since shopping in one case), and although in an emergency any of them could be relied upon to get through, it is obviously going to be easier to keep two only in good shape. The locos. chosen, both non-regular ones, Nos. 60030 an 60032, are recently ex-works, and the first Down train on Monday 28th was worked by 60030 and the up train by No. 60009 of Haymarket. These two completed the first week without untoward incident, No. 60030 on her first up trip arriving seven minutes early after a journey including at least eight bad P.W. checks. The stand-by engine 60032 has worked a train out and back daily, after seeing the non-stop safely on its way. | SLS/195408 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/04/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5325 | ||
19/04/1937 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
29/06/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4488 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1853 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
20/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937. | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided |
||
17/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
23/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. | ||
21/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9129 (Diagram 107) |
||
31/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
21/03/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
10/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 12/02/1943. | ||
03/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
08/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. | ||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 590 but not taken up | ||
05/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9128 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9 | ||
14/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1947. Dep: 21/02/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
21/02/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
22/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1948. Dep: 05/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8957 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5636 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. Renumbered to BR 60009 |
||
14/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 14/05/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948. Work undertaken: Tender change Tender number 5591 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
24/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1948. Dep: 25/06/1948. | ||
19/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1948. Dep: 03/12/1948. | ||
16/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1949. Dep: 04/08/1949. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
20/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950. | ||
21/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1952. Dep: 02/10/1952. Work undertaken: Long guard irons removed Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
02/10/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
16/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. | ||
12/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1954. Dep: 22/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29285 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1955. Dep: 17/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29278 (Diagram 107) |
||
02/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1956. Dep: 04/09/1956. | ||
01/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1957. Dep: 05/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) |
||
08/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1958. Dep: 18/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
12/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1960. Dep: 17/02/1960. Work undertaken: AWS and speed indicator fitted Boiler number 27965 (Diagram 107) |
||
01/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1961. Dep: 19/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27961 (Diagram 107) |
||
20/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
07/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1962. Dep: 16/08/1962. | ||
16/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1963. Dep: 06/11/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29337 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5332 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
05/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1963. Dep: 05/12/1963. | ||
05/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1964. Dep: 18/04/1964. | ||
01/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60009 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
17/07/1966 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5484 |