|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1937 | 04/06/1937 | 5 days | Special | Cleaning for exhibition at New Barnet |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1937 | 29/01/1938 | 33 days | General | Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1938 | 29/06/1938 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1939 | 14/01/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1939 | 06/05/1939 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1940 | 25/04/1940 | 18 days | General | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1941 | 26/07/1941 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5667 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. Side skirting removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/10/1941 | 11/10/1941 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1942 | 21/05/1942 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1943 | 10/09/1943 | 42 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 45 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1946 | 22/11/1946 | 1 day | Unclassified | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 23 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1947 | 23/07/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1948 | 25/03/1948 | 42 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60023 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1948 | 13/10/1948 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1949 | 31/08/1949 | 45 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1951 | 23/02/1951 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1952 | 04/09/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29276 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1952 | 24/09/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1954 | 01/03/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29292 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1955 | 21/07/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1957 | 20/02/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1958 | 28/02/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1958 | 18/09/1958 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29328 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1959 | 23/03/1959 | 38 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1959 | 14/04/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1960 | 10/06/1960 | 44 days | General | Speed indieator fitted Boiler number 29337 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1961 | 28/02/1961 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1961 | 01/12/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1962 | 10/01/1963 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
31/07/1950 | Inverurie Works | Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. | SLS/195010 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/12/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4482, name: GOLDEN EAGLE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1847 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
31/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. | ||
31/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 04/06/1937. Work undertaken: Cleaning for exhibition at New Barnet |
||
28/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1937. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
29/01/1938 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
25/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
21/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1938. Dep: 29/06/1938. | ||
07/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 14/01/1939. | ||
17/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. | ||
08/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1940. Dep: 25/04/1940. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
05/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5667 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. Side skirting removed |
||
01/08/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
08/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941. | ||
05/01/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
04/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1942. Dep: 21/05/1942. | ||
31/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1943. Dep: 10/09/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
10/09/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
29/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 584 but not taken up | ||
15/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
22/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1946. Dep: 22/11/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 23 |
||
23/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/07/1947. Dep: 23/07/1947. | ||
13/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1948. Dep: 25/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60023 |
||
28/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1948. Dep: 13/10/1948. | ||
18/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 31/08/1949. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
22/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951. | ||
06/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1952. Dep: 04/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29276 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
23/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1952. Dep: 24/09/1952. | ||
19/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 01/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29292 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
10/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1955. Dep: 21/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107) |
||
16/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1957. Dep: 20/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) |
||
24/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 28/02/1958. | ||
29/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1958. Dep: 18/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29328 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
14/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1959. Dep: 23/03/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
08/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1959. Dep: 14/04/1959. | ||
28/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960. Work undertaken: Speed indieator fitted Boiler number 29337 (Diagram 107) |
||
17/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1961. Dep: 28/02/1961. | ||
06/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1961. Dep: 01/12/1961. | ||
21/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1962. Dep: 10/01/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107) |
||
28/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
30/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60023 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |