|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1931 | 13/11/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1932 | 18/11/1932 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1933 | 24/11/1933 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1934 | 07/01/1935 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 8079 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1935 | 24/01/1936 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1936 | 21/10/1936 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5572 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1937 | 10/07/1937 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1937 | 15/12/1937 | 29 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1938 | 27/04/1938 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1938 | 17/01/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1940 | 03/05/1940 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1941 | 05/10/1941 | 46 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/05/1942 | 29/05/1942 | 18 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1942 | 21/10/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9449 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1945 | 04/10/1945 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1946 | 21/03/1946 | 22 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 565 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1946 | 17/01/1947 | 26 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1947 | 26/06/1947 | 42 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1948 | 20/10/1948 | 52 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60087 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1950 | 17/08/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9121 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1952 | 04/07/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1953 | 04/01/1954 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1954 | 11/01/1955 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1955 | 02/09/1955 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1956 | 16/11/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27050 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1957 | 04/12/1957 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1958 | 12/08/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1959 | 03/02/1960 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1960 | 19/07/1960 | 50 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1961 | 02/02/1962 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/06/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2598, name: BLENHEIM Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1743 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
08/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1931. Dep: 13/11/1931. | ||
03/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1932. Dep: 18/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
12/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1933. Dep: 24/11/1933. | ||
22/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1934. Dep: 07/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8079 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
28/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1935. Dep: 24/01/1936. | ||
01/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1936. Dep: 21/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5572 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
31/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937. | ||
29/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
16/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
17/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/11/1937. Dep: 15/12/1937. | ||
08/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
26/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1938. Dep: 27/04/1938. | ||
29/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1938. Dep: 17/01/1939. | ||
09/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
08/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1940. Dep: 03/05/1940. | ||
20/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
21/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1941. Dep: 05/10/1941. | ||
18/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
12/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/05/1942. Dep: 29/05/1942. | ||
23/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1942. Dep: 21/10/1942. | ||
09/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9449 (Diagram 94A) |
||
20/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1945. Dep: 04/10/1945. | ||
28/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/02/1946. Dep: 21/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 565 |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 87 | ||
23/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1946. Dep: 17/01/1947. | ||
16/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/05/1947. Dep: 26/06/1947. | ||
30/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 20/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60087 |
||
11/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1950. Dep: 17/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9121 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) |
||
09/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
25/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1953. Dep: 04/01/1954. | ||
14/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1954. Dep: 11/01/1955. | ||
28/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955. | ||
09/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27050 (Diagram 94A) |
||
01/1957 | Modification | Modification: To 75% Cut-off | ||
07/11/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5255 | ||
15/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1957. Dep: 04/12/1957. | ||
18/12/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5572 | ||
01/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1958. Dep: 12/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A) |
||
09/1958 | Modification | Modification: Double Chimney fitted | ||
21/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1959. Dep: 03/02/1960. | ||
31/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1960. Dep: 19/07/1960. | ||
13/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
28/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
08/1961 | Modification | Modification: Trough deflectors fitted | ||
03/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
14/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1961. Dep: 02/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) |
||
28/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60087 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |