|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1931 | 04/03/1931 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1931 | 02/07/1931 | 38 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1931 | 19/11/1931 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1932 | 09/06/1932 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1933 | 24/05/1933 | 58 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1934 | 16/06/1934 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27019 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1935 | 27/04/1935 | 61 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1936 | 29/05/1936 | 53 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1937 | 31/05/1937 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 8079 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5232 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1938 | 04/06/1938 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1939 | 20/10/1939 | 47 days | General | Hudd ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1940 | 08/11/1940 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1941 | 20/12/1941 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1943 | 14/05/1943 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8223 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1944 | 24/02/1944 | 9 days | Unclassified | Tender number 5568 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1945 | 22/12/1945 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1946 | 16/08/1946 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 38 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E99 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1949 | 21/07/1949 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9982 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60099 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1950 | 23/01/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27025 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1952 | 01/07/1952 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1953 | 20/01/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29317 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1955 | 14/07/1955 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1956 | 25/01/1957 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1958 | 29/07/1958 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1959 | 05/12/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1960 | 31/12/1960 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1960 | 03/01/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1961 | 01/07/1961 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
31/07/1961 | Modified class A3\'s outshopped | Further Class A3 Pacifics out-shopped ex-Doncaster Works with Dia. 107 boilers have been 60067 Ladas during April, followed by 60075 St. Frusquin in May, whilst trough-pattern smoke deflectors were fitted to 60088 Book Law during June, and 60077 The White Knight and 60099 Call Boy in July. | SLS/196109 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/04/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2795, name: CALL BOY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1738 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
17/06/1930 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5328 | ||
12/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1931. Dep: 04/03/1931. | ||
26/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1931. Dep: 02/07/1931. | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 19/11/1931. | ||
22/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1932. Dep: 09/06/1932. | ||
28/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/03/1933. Dep: 24/05/1933. | ||
26/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27019 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
26/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/02/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935. | ||
07/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/04/1936. Dep: 29/05/1936. | ||
15/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1937. Dep: 31/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8079 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5232 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
25/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938. | ||
04/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1939. Dep: 20/10/1939. Work undertaken: Hudd ATC fitted |
||
12/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
03/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1940. Dep: 08/11/1940. | ||
19/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
06/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941. | ||
13/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1943. Dep: 14/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8223 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
16/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1944. Dep: 24/02/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 5568 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
07/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. | ||
21/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 567 but not taken up | ||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 99 | ||
24/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/07/1946. Dep: 16/08/1946. | ||
06/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. | ||
28/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E99 |
||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 21/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9982 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60099 |
||
18/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1950. Dep: 23/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27025 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1952. Dep: 01/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
10/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1953. Dep: 20/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29317 (Diagram 107) |
||
27/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1955. Dep: 14/07/1955. | ||
11/1956 | Modification | Modification: To 75% Cut-off | ||
11/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1956. Dep: 25/01/1957. | ||
09/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1958. Dep: 29/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) |
||
08/1958 | Modification | Modification: Double Chimney fitted | ||
28/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 05/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107) |
||
30/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1960. Dep: 31/12/1960. | ||
31/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1960. Dep: 03/01/1961. | ||
19/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1961. Dep: 01/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) |
||
02/1962 | Modification | Modification: Trough deflectors fitted | ||
06/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
28/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60099 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |