|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1928 | 02/10/1928 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1929 | 03/01/1930 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1930 | 24/01/1930 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1931 | 14/03/1931 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1932 | 29/03/1932 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 8075 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1933 | 08/03/1933 | 45 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8029 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1934 | 28/04/1934 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1935 | 10/04/1935 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1936 | 30/04/1936 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 8247 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1936 | 11/12/1936 | 10 days | General | Tender number 5267 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 25 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1937 | 05/10/1937 | 43 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1938 | 14/04/1938 | 13 days | General | Castlecary disaster replacement - believed to be an almost entirely new locomotive to replace the or Boiler number 8029 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5263 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1940 | 13/09/1940 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1941 | 22/02/1941 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1941 | 10/01/1942 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1942 | 18/11/1942 | 48 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1944 | 01/09/1944 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9453 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 32 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1949 | 16/02/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9977 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Renumbered to BR 60090 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1950 | 01/11/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1952 | 15/05/1952 | 31 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1952 | 14/11/1952 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1953 | 17/04/1953 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1953 | 18/12/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27062 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1955 | 27/05/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27025 (Diagram 94A) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 21/08/1955 | 29/08/1955 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1957 | 26/03/1957 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 04/02/1958 | 11/02/1958 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1958 | 08/08/1958 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27045 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1959 | 16/09/1959 | 71 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1961 | 08/05/1961 | 62 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1962 | 21/01/1963 | 64 days | Light Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1963 | 15/08/1963 | 37 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2744, name: GRAND PARADE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1694 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
24/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/09/1928. Dep: 02/10/1928. | ||
29/06/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5273 | ||
11/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1929. Dep: 03/01/1930. | ||
24/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1930. Dep: 24/01/1930. | ||
21/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931. | ||
29/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1932. Dep: 29/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8075 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
03/08/1932 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5331 | ||
20/01/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5273 | ||
23/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/01/1933. Dep: 08/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8029 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
18/07/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5331 | ||
05/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. | ||
09/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1935. Dep: 10/04/1935. | ||
06/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1936. Dep: 30/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8247 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
02/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1936. Dep: 11/12/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 5267 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
14/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. | ||
07/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
24/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/08/1937. Dep: 05/10/1937. | ||
31/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1938. Dep: 14/04/1938. Work undertaken: Castlecary disaster replacement - believed to be an almost entirely new locomotive to replace the or Boiler number 8029 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5263 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
04/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. | ||
13/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1940. Dep: 13/09/1940. | ||
17/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941. | ||
12/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. | ||
02/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1942. Dep: 18/11/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
01/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
11/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
20/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1944. Dep: 01/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9453 (Diagram 94A) |
||
16/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 553 but not taken up | ||
09/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90 | ||
23/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
15/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 16/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9977 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Renumbered to BR 60090 |
||
16/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
16/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
02/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/05/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5261 | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
25/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1950. Dep: 01/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
01/11/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
15/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1952. Dep: 15/05/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
15/05/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
30/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952. | ||
30/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 17/04/1953. | ||
18/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1953. Dep: 18/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27062 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27025 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1955. Dep: 29/08/1955. | ||
04/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1957. Dep: 26/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A) |
||
11/06/1957 | Report | Report: On June 11 "A3s" Nos. 60043/90 and 60100, all of Haymarket, were all seen on Leeds, together with "V2s" Nos. 60804 and 60937 of Dundee (Tay Bridge). No. 60937 appeared 100 min. late, piloted by standard Class "5" 4-6-0 No. 73166 (SOA), on the up "North Briton." (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
04/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1958. Dep: 11/02/1958. | ||
16/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1958. Dep: 08/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27045 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/07/1959. Dep: 16/09/1959. Work undertaken: Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
21/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
19/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1961. Dep: 08/05/1961. | ||
18/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
19/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1962. Dep: 21/01/1963. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
31/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
14/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
10/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1963. Dep: 15/08/1963. | ||
28/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60090 from St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
24/01/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |