|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1929 | 10/01/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1930 | 28/02/1930 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1930 | 31/05/1930 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 8253 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1932 | 14/07/1932 | 49 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1933 | 10/07/1933 | 53 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8027 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1934 | 01/09/1934 | 32 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1935 | 18/10/1935 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1935 | 13/11/1935 | 16 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8254 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1936 | 01/12/1936 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1937 | 03/04/1937 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1937 | 20/10/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1938 | 19/02/1938 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1938 | 05/03/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1938 | 16/03/1938 | 1 day | Special | Fitted with Stone Deuta Speed Recorder |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1939 | 01/04/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 8030 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1942 | 10/05/1942 | 39 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1943 | 16/09/1943 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1944 | 23/02/1944 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1945 | 14/06/1945 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1946 | 18/09/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 9512 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 89 |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1948 | 03/09/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 9115 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60089 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1949 | 16/09/1949 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1950 | 27/10/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27004 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1950 | 24/11/1950 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27073 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1953 | 13/10/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 07/04/1954 | 16/04/1954 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1955 | 18/02/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1956 | 26/09/1956 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1958 | 21/05/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1959 | 09/10/1959 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1959 | 03/03/1960 | 128 days | General | After accident Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5254 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1960 | 31/05/1960 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
St. Rollox Works | 31/01/1961 | 11/02/1961 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1961 | 11/10/1961 | 22 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) (Ex-Works on Shed) | Ex-Works on Shed: 43159, 60089, 61089. D5821. | SLS/196112 |
02/11/1963 | Inverurie Works (Awaiting scrapping) | Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. | SLS/196402 |
18/01/1964 | Bedford MPD (Scrapped) | Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. | SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/08/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2743, name: FELSTEAD Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1693 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
06/02/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5255 | ||
21/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1929. Dep: 10/01/1930. | ||
25/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1930. Dep: 28/02/1930. | ||
26/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930. | ||
07/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8253 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
27/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/05/1932. Dep: 14/07/1932. | ||
19/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/05/1933. Dep: 10/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8027 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
01/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934. | ||
26/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1935. Dep: 18/10/1935. | ||
29/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/10/1935. Dep: 13/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8254 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
15/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
17/07/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1936. Dep: 01/12/1936. | ||
30/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1937. Dep: 03/04/1937. | ||
19/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1937. Dep: 20/10/1937. | ||
18/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938. | ||
04/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. | ||
16/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 16/03/1938. Dep: 16/03/1938. Work undertaken: Fitted with Stone Deuta Speed Recorder |
||
18/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939. | ||
11/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8030 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
09/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
02/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1942. Dep: 10/05/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
10/05/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
14/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1943. Dep: 16/09/1943. | ||
15/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1944. Dep: 23/02/1944. | ||
28/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 14/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 552 but not taken up | ||
19/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
31/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1946. Dep: 18/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9512 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 89 |
||
27/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1948. Dep: 03/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9115 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60089 |
||
17/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1949. Dep: 16/09/1949. | ||
19/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1950. Dep: 27/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27004 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
15/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1950. Dep: 24/11/1950. | ||
18/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27073 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
21/03/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
14/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1953. Dep: 13/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
07/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1954. Dep: 16/04/1954. | ||
15/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 18/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
09/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1956. Dep: 26/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/11/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5572 | ||
18/12/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5255 | ||
12/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1958. Dep: 21/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) |
||
19/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 09/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
28/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 03/03/1960. Work undertaken: After accident Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5254 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
29/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1960. Dep: 31/05/1960. | ||
21/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
19/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1961. Dep: 11/02/1961. | ||
20/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1961. Dep: 11/10/1961. | ||
11/1961 | Modification | Modification: Trough deflectors fitted | ||
10/11/1961 | Modification | Diagram 107 number 29329 boiler fitted | ||
14/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60089 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
02/11/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |