|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 17/09/1923 | 19/09/1923 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1924 | 29/01/1925 | 104 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/06/1926 | 18/06/1926 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/12/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1927 | 29/03/1927 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1927 | 07/11/1927 | 214 days | General | New crank axle |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1927 | 23/11/1927 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/06/1929 | 25/06/1929 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1929 | 17/07/1929 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1929 | 08/11/1929 | 72 days | General | Bronze axleboxes Boiler number 1606 (Diagram 47) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1930 | 13/02/1930 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1930 | 06/08/1930 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1931 | 21/01/1931 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1931 | 12/03/1931 | 39 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1931 | 19/08/1931 | 42 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1931 | 05/11/1931 | 79 days | General | New cylinders and steam brake |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1932 | 17/02/1933 | 74 days | Heavy | Boiler number 1447 (Diagram 47) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1933 | 15/12/1933 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1934 | 09/10/1934 | 28 days | Unclassified | 8 wheel tender |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1935 | 18/07/1935 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1936 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/12/1922 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2401 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1171 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 47 boiler fitted |
||
17/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1923. Dep: 19/09/1923. | ||
04/1924 | Naming | Named 'CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL' | ||
18/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1924. Dep: 29/01/1925. | ||
16/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1926. Dep: 18/06/1926. | ||
29/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. | ||
18/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1927. Dep: 29/03/1927. | ||
08/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1927. Dep: 07/11/1927. Work undertaken: New crank axle |
||
11/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1927. Dep: 23/11/1927. | ||
06/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1929. Dep: 25/06/1929. | ||
09/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1929. Dep: 17/07/1929. | ||
29/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1929. Dep: 08/11/1929. Work undertaken: Bronze axleboxes Boiler number 1606 (Diagram 47) |
||
11/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1930. Dep: 13/02/1930. | ||
28/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1930. Dep: 06/08/1930. | ||
07/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1931. Dep: 21/01/1931. | ||
02/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1931. Dep: 12/03/1931. | ||
09/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1931. Dep: 19/08/1931. | ||
19/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1931. Dep: 05/11/1931. Work undertaken: New cylinders and steam brake |
||
06/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/12/1932. Dep: 17/02/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1447 (Diagram 47) |
||
27/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1933. Dep: 15/12/1933. | ||
09/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
12/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1934. Dep: 09/10/1934. Work undertaken: 8 wheel tender |
||
01/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1935. Dep: 18/07/1935. | ||
13/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/01/1936. | ||
03/07/1936 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2401 from York (North) (YK) | ||
15/08/1936 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |