|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 19/04/1950 | 19/04/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1950 | 23/08/1950 | 38 days | General | Named SAINT MUNGO |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1951 | 01/01/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29862 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1953 | 17/04/1953 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1954 | 12/10/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29837 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1956 | 09/03/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1957 | 05/10/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29820 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1958 | 02/10/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1958 | 24/01/1959 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1959 | 12/01/1960 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1960 | 23/12/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1962 | 04/10/1962 | 39 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1963 | 01/02/1964 | 97 days | General | Boiler number 29875 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1964 | 22/10/1964 | 38 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (under repair) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/03/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60145 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2064 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
19/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/04/1950. Dep: 19/04/1950. | ||
17/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1950. Dep: 23/08/1950. Work undertaken: Named SAINT MUNGO |
||
23/08/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
29/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1951. Dep: 01/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29862 (Diagram 118) |
||
01/01/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
11/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1953. Dep: 17/04/1953. | ||
02/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1954. Dep: 12/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29837 (Diagram 118) |
||
07/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1956. Dep: 09/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
02/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29820 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1958. Dep: 02/10/1958. | ||
17/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1958. Dep: 24/01/1959. | ||
21/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1959. Dep: 12/01/1960. | ||
10/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1960. Dep: 23/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29807 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
27/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1962. Dep: 04/10/1962. | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
28/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1963. Dep: 01/02/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29875 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/09/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1964. Dep: 22/10/1964. | ||
02/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
17/04/1966 | Reinstated | Reinstated to York (North) (50A) | ||
19/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60145 from York (North) (50A) |