|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1949 | 21/12/1949 | 64 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1950 | 19/05/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1950 | 31/10/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1950 | 08/12/1950 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | Named ALCAZAR |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1951 | 17/01/1952 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1953 | 24/04/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 10599 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1953 | 20/07/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1954 | 17/08/1954 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1954 | 30/11/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1955 | 16/01/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 10596 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1957 | 19/07/1957 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1957 | 02/08/1957 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1957 | 21/11/1957 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1957 | 01/12/1957 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1958 | 30/04/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1958 | 06/05/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1959 | 11/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1959 | 22/05/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29861 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1960 | 27/07/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1961 | 25/03/1961 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29784 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1961 | 21/04/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1961 | 02/05/1961 | 9 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
31/12/1950 | Miscellaneous | Newly-named 'Al' are Nos. 60136 Alcazar and 60149 Amadis. A 'Claud' has worked the Cambridge and Garden Cities buffet-car trains into King's Cross at 1.40 p.m., and so has an 'Ll' 2-6-4T. | SLS/195102 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/11/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60136 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2055 Allocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
19/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/10/1949. Dep: 21/12/1949. | ||
15/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950. Work undertaken: ATC fitted |
||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
30/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1950. Dep: 31/10/1950. | ||
09/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/11/1950. Dep: 08/12/1950. Work undertaken: Named ALCAZAR |
||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
26/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 17/01/1952. | ||
17/01/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
23/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1953. Dep: 24/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10599 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 20/07/1953. Dep: 20/07/1953. | ||
13/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1954. Dep: 17/08/1954. | ||
30/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/11/1954. Dep: 30/11/1954. | ||
13/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1955. Dep: 16/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10596 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. | ||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
04/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1957. Dep: 19/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1957. Dep: 02/08/1957. | ||
12/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1957. Dep: 21/11/1957. | ||
30/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1957. Dep: 01/12/1957. | ||
06/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
21/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/04/1958. Dep: 30/04/1958. | ||
03/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1958. Dep: 06/05/1958. | ||
03/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 11/03/1959. | ||
05/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1959. Dep: 22/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29861 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1960. Dep: 27/07/1960. | ||
13/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29784 (Diagram 117) |
||
18/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1961. Dep: 21/04/1961. | ||
24/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1961. Dep: 02/05/1961. | ||
22/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60136 from Doncaster (36A) |