|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/08/1949 | 12/08/1949 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 73 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1950 | 12/04/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/05/1950 | 23/05/1950 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1950 | 04/07/1950 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1950 | 06/10/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) Named MADGE WILDFIRE |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/03/1951 | 19/03/1951 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1951 | 01/08/1951 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1952 | 11/12/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29838 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1953 | 11/11/1953 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1954 | 31/08/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 10594 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1956 | 04/02/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29819 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1957 | 12/07/1957 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29877 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1958 | 11/06/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1958 | 03/12/1958 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29876 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1959 | 21/02/1959 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1960 | 14/09/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29842 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/11/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60135 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2054 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
02/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1949. Dep: 12/08/1949. | ||
22/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. | ||
12/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/04/1950. Dep: 12/04/1950. | ||
17/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1950. Dep: 23/05/1950. | ||
29/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1950. Dep: 04/07/1950. | ||
30/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1950. Dep: 06/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) Named MADGE WILDFIRE |
||
13/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/03/1951. Dep: 19/03/1951. | ||
04/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 01/08/1951. | ||
07/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1952. Dep: 11/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29838 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/12/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
19/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/10/1953. Dep: 11/11/1953. | ||
28/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1954. Dep: 31/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10594 (Diagram 118) |
||
04/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1956. Dep: 04/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29819 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1957. Dep: 12/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29877 (Diagram 118) |
||
02/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1958. Dep: 11/06/1958. | ||
21/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1958. Dep: 03/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29876 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1959. Dep: 21/02/1959. | ||
04/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1960. Dep: 14/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29842 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
01/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60135 from Ardsley (56B) |