|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 15/11/1948 | 28/11/1948 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1949 | 11/03/1949 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1949 | 23/09/1949 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1950 | 12/04/1950 | 66 days | General | Named POMMERN |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1950 | 09/11/1950 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1951 | 09/02/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1952 | 19/06/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 10592 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1952 | 16/07/1952 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1953 | 25/02/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1954 | 15/04/1954 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1955 | 24/08/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1956 | 12/11/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1957 | 19/01/1957 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1957 | 04/07/1957 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29812 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29838 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1960 | 02/03/1960 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1960 | 12/05/1960 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1961 | 21/01/1961 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1961 | 01/04/1961 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1962 | 22/10/1962 | 36 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1964 | 15/05/1964 | 52 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/10/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60133 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2052 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1948. Dep: 28/11/1948. | ||
19/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 11/03/1949. | ||
15/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 23/09/1949. | ||
06/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1950. Dep: 12/04/1950. Work undertaken: Named POMMERN |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
06/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1950. Dep: 09/11/1950. | ||
12/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/01/1951. Dep: 09/02/1951. | ||
20/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1952. Dep: 19/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10592 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/06/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
04/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1952. Dep: 16/07/1952. | ||
20/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1953. Dep: 25/02/1953. | ||
17/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/03/1954. Dep: 15/04/1954. | ||
06/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
22/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. | ||
22/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1955. Dep: 24/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 12/11/1956. | ||
04/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1957. Dep: 19/01/1957. | ||
17/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1957. Dep: 04/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29812 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29838 (Diagram 118) |
||
29/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/02/1960. Dep: 02/03/1960. | ||
28/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1960. Dep: 12/05/1960. | ||
09/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1961. Dep: 21/01/1961. | ||
17/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/02/1961. Dep: 01/04/1961. | ||
17/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1962. Dep: 22/10/1962. | ||
25/03/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1964. Dep: 15/05/1964. | ||
21/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60133 from Ardsley (56B) |