|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 08/05/1950 | 15/05/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1950 | 10/11/1950 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | Named GUY MANNERING |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1951 | 22/01/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1952 | 27/02/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29814 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1953 | 08/07/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29800 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1954 | 09/11/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29862 (Diagram 118) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/07/1955 | 15/07/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1956 | 31/01/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1956 | 16/05/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 10593 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29779 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1958 | 13/08/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1959 | 02/09/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 10595 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1961 | 17/03/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29780 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1961 | 28/09/1961 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1961 | 06/10/1961 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1962 | 24/02/1962 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1963 | 07/12/1963 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 29870 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1963 | 12/12/1963 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/06/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60129 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2046 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Livery applied: BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
08/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 15/05/1950. | ||
11/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1950. Dep: 10/11/1950. Work undertaken: Named GUY MANNERING |
||
22/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 22/01/1951. | ||
28/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1952. Dep: 27/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29814 (Diagram 118) |
||
27/02/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
01/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1953. Dep: 08/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29800 (Diagram 118) |
||
05/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 09/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29862 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 15/07/1955. | ||
31/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 31/01/1956. | ||
11/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1956. Dep: 16/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10593 (Diagram 118) |
||
30/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29779 (Diagram 117) |
||
05/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1958. Dep: 13/08/1958. | ||
28/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1959. Dep: 02/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10595 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
10/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 17/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29780 (Diagram 117) |
||
18/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961. | ||
03/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1961. Dep: 06/10/1961. | ||
19/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1962. Dep: 24/02/1962. | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
25/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1963. Dep: 07/12/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29870 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1963. Dep: 12/12/1963. | ||
06/12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60129 from York (North) (50A) |