|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1949 | 10/01/1949 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1949 | 21/01/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1950 | 05/05/1950 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1951 | 13/06/1951 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1951 | 25/10/1951 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1952 | 02/10/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29823 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1952 | 14/11/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1954 | 24/03/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1954 | 27/08/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1954 | 25/11/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1955 | 18/10/1955 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1956 | 02/03/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29804 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1957 | 24/08/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 10596 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1957 | 18/12/1957 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1958 | 23/05/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1959 | 29/04/1959 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1959 | 23/10/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29813 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1960 | 25/11/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1961 | 22/09/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1962 | 24/10/1962 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1962 | 11/12/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
31/08/1950 | A.1 namings | Latest reported nameplates affixed to 'A.1' Class: 60117 Bois Rousell; 60118 Archibald Sturrock; 60119 Patrick Stirling; 60122 Curlew; 60123 H. A. Ivatt; 60126 Sir Vincent Raven; 60130 Kestrel; 60140 Balmoral. | SLS/195010 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/12/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60122 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2039 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
04/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1949. Dep: 10/01/1949. | ||
18/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1949. Dep: 21/01/1949. | ||
27/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 05/05/1950. | ||
05/05/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
07/1950 | Naming | Named 'CURLEW' | ||
07/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1951. Dep: 13/06/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
01/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1951. Dep: 25/10/1951. | ||
26/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1952. Dep: 02/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29823 (Diagram 118) |
||
02/10/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
04/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952. | ||
18/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
22/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1954. Dep: 24/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1954. Dep: 27/08/1954. | ||
17/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1954. Dep: 25/11/1954. | ||
28/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
22/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1955. Dep: 18/10/1955. | ||
24/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1956. Dep: 02/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29804 (Diagram 118) |
||
23/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10596 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1957. Dep: 18/12/1957. | ||
14/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1958. Dep: 23/05/1958. | ||
05/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1959. Dep: 29/04/1959. | ||
16/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29813 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1960. Dep: 25/11/1960. | ||
14/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1961. Dep: 22/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
17/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/10/1962. Dep: 24/10/1962. | ||
11/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/12/1962. Dep: 11/12/1962. | ||
17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60122 from Doncaster (36A) |