Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2871 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16277 Week
» 69293 Month
» 188820 Year
» 3215673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
5394 |
m/e |
10/1920 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
211 |
Works Number |
2794 |
To Service |
During 10/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 07/01/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
85D |
Kidderminster |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5394 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2794 |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D) |
|
|
07/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5394 |
|
|