Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
5390 |
m/e |
10/1920 |
Great Western Railway (1st Renum) |
8390 |
on |
06/03/1928 |
Great Western Railway (2nd Renum) |
5390 |
m/e |
09/1944 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
211 |
Works Number |
2790 |
To Service |
During 10/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 13/08/1958 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81D |
Reading (W.R.) |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
ALLOC |
84B |
Oxley |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
ALLOC |
81E |
Didcot |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1941 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1959 |
Swindon Works (Scrapyard) |
Scrapyard1401/23/9/37/56/7/57, 2254, 2812/23/5/30/3, 4200/26/61, 4377, 4540/53/84, 5315/55/82/6/8/90, 5566, 5703/8/33/43, 5810, 6318/22/8/31/4/54, 6409/28, 6721/3/7/43, 7738. |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5390 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2790 |
|
|
06/03/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8390 |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
14/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
08/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
09/1944 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5390 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
31/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
13/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5390 |
|
|