Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2151 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19954 Week
» 72970 Month
» 192497 Year
» 3219350 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
5378 |
m/e |
08/1919 |
Great Western Railway (1st Renum) |
8378 |
on |
03/03/1928 |
Great Western Railway (2nd Renum) |
5378 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
209 |
Works Number |
2750 |
To Service |
During 08/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/09/1959 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LLY |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
05/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
84B |
Oxley |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
83E |
St Blazey |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
84E |
Tyseley |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
ALLOC |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5378 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2750 |
|
|
03/03/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8378 |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
06/1944 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5378 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (LLY) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
14/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5378 |
|
|