|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5326 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2698 |
||
01/1928 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8326 | ||
01/01/1934 | Allocation | |||
06/1944 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5326 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Westbury (WES) | ||
26/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM) | ||
04/1950 | Modification | Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted | ||
05/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
24/04/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
22/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
02/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Didcot (81E) | ||
27/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
15/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5326 |