Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 281 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21315 Week
» 119960 Month
» 322624 Year
» 3349477 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
5321 |
m/e |
08/1917 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
206 |
Works Number |
2693 |
To Service |
During 08/1917 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/09/1959 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83B |
Taunton |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1939 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/11/1946 |
Exeter MPD |
On 16/11, the following were observed on Exeter shed: 3018, 3395, 3451, 4954, 5051, 5321, 6421, 6957 and 6963; whilst L.M.S. 8.F 8409 and 8421 were on passing freight trains. 1449 and 1468 were working the Heathfield branch and 3335 and 6385 were station pilots. The 11.25 a.m. (G.W.) stopping train to Plymouth was worked by S.R. 21C118 |
SLS/194701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5321 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2693 |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exeter (EXE) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
14/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5321 |
|
|