Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 691 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14097 Week
» 67113 Month
» 186640 Year
» 3213493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4530 |
m/e |
04/1913 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
45xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
191 |
Works Number |
2496 |
To Service |
During 04/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 17/03/1955 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,058,505 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
89C |
Machynlleth |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
83B |
Taunton |
w/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
m/e |
30/04/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4530 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2496 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exeter (EXE) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
17/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4530 |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|