Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2913 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16319 Week
» 69335 Month
» 188862 Year
» 3215715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Original) |
2184 |
m/e |
03/1909 |
Great Western Railway |
4523 |
on |
28/12/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
45xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
174 |
Works Number |
2313 |
To Service |
During 03/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/10/1955 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,107,059 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83E |
St Blazey |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
ALLOC |
83F |
Truro |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2184 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2313 |
|
|
28/12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4523 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Truro (TR) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
19/11/1953 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Truro (83F) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4523 |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|