Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 102 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2009 Week
» 20791 Month
» 269084 Year
» 1153465 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 5407 m/e 09/1937
BR 45407 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class Black Five
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1462
To Service During 09/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/08/1968
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 27/03/1954
17A Derby 4w/e 06/11/1954
21A Saltley 4w/e 04/12/1954
17A Derby 4w/e 24/03/1956
14B Kentish Town m/e 16/06/1956
16A Nottingham w/e 23/01/1960
17B Burton w/e 07/04/1962
8C Speke Junction w/e 13/03/1965
10D Lostock Hall w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 06/09/1947
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 14E Bedford 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 17B Burton 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall w/e 11/05/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 10/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1937 To Service To service as LMS Number 5407
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1462
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 45407    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
07/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
13/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 45407    

prev prev