Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19929 Week
» 72945 Month
» 192472 Year
» 3219325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4271 |
m/e |
02/1920 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
213 |
Works Number |
2851 |
To Service |
During 02/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/12/1963 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4271 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2851 |
|
|
29/12/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
16/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4271 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|