Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1728 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19531 Week
» 72547 Month
» 192074 Year
» 3218927 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46498 |
on |
27/02/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2190 |
To Service |
Mon 27/02/1952 to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/09/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/02/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46498 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2190 Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
20/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46498 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|