|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/1952 | C.K. & P. Section | 2-6-0's Nos. 46491 an 46457(12D) were noted at Bassenthwaite Lake station on 2/7: both are 12D. | SLS/195208 |
11/08/1956 | West Cumberland Visit | SLS members gathered by devious routes in the Citadel station at Carlisle, the writer travelling G. & S.W. from Glasgow 'spotting' ex G.E. 2-4-2T No. 67157 awaiting scrapping at Kilmarnock works with several compound 4-4-0's and K2 2-6-0's. While at Dumfries the last of the McIntosh 19' Class 0-4-4T's (No. 55124) was seen, the London Midland Region striving to cope with large holiday crowds. Matters were not improved by the 'Royal Scot' being halted for a quarter of an hour at platform 3 for its Pacific, 46224, to be replaced by 46252. Our connection, the Perth-London, departed 21½ minutes late at 1-16½ behind 46242 and on arrival at Penrith it was found that temporary alterations had been made in the service on the C.K. & P.-the 1-30 p.m. to Workington followed the through train from Manchester to Keswick. This comprised Class 2MT 2-6-0's Nos. 46456/7, coupled tender to tender, with eight corridors. Traversing Lakeland in brilliant sunshine, after early rain, we descended at tree-shaded Keswick and continued by the retimed 1-30 which was worked by 46491. At Workington (Main), reached at 3-49, a visit was paid to the shed where the centre of attraction was ex-Furness 0-6-0 No. 52499 (with L. & Y. boiler). Another of these locos., 52510, was seen on a freight. The plan to return immediately to Carlisle to do Silloth had now to be abandoned, in any case on Saturdays this branch is taken over from the diesels by J39's and instead we carried on along the coast to Whitehaven by the 4-28 (3.25 ex-Carlisle) which was another steam train-2-6-4T No. 42544 with four packed coaches. At Whitehaven (Bransty) cameras were focussed on un-rebuilt Patriot No. 45542 which came in with a train from the south. Earlier, Stanier 2-6-0 No. 42962 had been seen on one of these, before rejoining the train which now formed the 5-15 to Carlisle. However, some diehards waited for the 6-15 departure and at last ran a diesel set to earth. After traversing the erstwhile Maryport and Carlisle line, the Citadel station was reached 2 minutes late at 6-40 p.m. when a final spot of excitement was provided by our using the same platform as the empty stock of the Royal Train which, that morning, had arrived at Appleby with the Queen and Duke of Edinburgh. It departed northwards in charge of Class SMT 4-6-0's Nos. 44676 an 45455. | SLS/195610 |
20/09/1964 | Crewe Works (Works Yard) | Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. | SLS/196410 |
15/11/1964 | Crewe North MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works: D208, D380, D1631/2, 42546, 46491 44803, 70033, 78023; Stored: 45552/4/6, 45617/72/6, 45704, 46228/35/9/40/5/8,51/4/6, 71000. Also on shed: D1585, D1697, D1744, 5056. | SLS/196412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 46491 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2183 Allocated to Workington (12D) |
||
30/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12C) | ||
23/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Workington (12D) | ||
06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46491 | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |