Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14432 Week
» 67448 Month
» 186975 Year
» 3213828 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46482 |
m/e |
10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2174 |
To Service |
During 10/1951 to West Auckland (51F) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/08/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Wed 10/11/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46482 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2174 Allocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46482 |
|
|
10/11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|