Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 369 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18172 Week
» 71188 Month
» 190715 Year
» 3217568 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46477 |
m/e |
09/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2169 |
To Service |
During 09/1951 to Darlington (51A) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1962 |
Service Life |
11 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
51A |
Darlington |
on |
12/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
18/06/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46477 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2169 Allocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46477 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|