Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 447 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18250 Week
» 71266 Month
» 190793 Year
» 3217646 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46474 |
m/e |
08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2166 |
To Service |
During 08/1951 to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Thu 23/07/1964 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46474 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2166 Allocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
17/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
23/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46474 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon |
|
|