Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46468 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2160 |
To Service |
During 07/1951 to Colchester (30E) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 18/10/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Tue 01/02/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46468 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2160 Allocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oban (63C) |
|
|
03/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oban (63C) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
18/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46468 |
|
|
01/02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|