Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4491 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18534 Week
» 83488 Month
» 286152 Year
» 3313005 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43140 |
on |
08/08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Wed 08/08/1951 to Polmont (64E) |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1967 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/09/1964 |
Darlington MPD (Shed) |
On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. |
SLS/196410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/08/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43140 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Polmont (64E) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
30/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
26/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
07/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43140 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|