Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3228 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16634 Week
» 69650 Month
» 189177 Year
» 3216030 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43106 |
on |
10/04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
Sat 10/04/1951 to South Lynn (31D) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/06/1968 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/04/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43106 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
23/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
17/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
21/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
27/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
23/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
22/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43106 |
|
|