Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2327 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15733 Week
» 68749 Month
» 188276 Year
» 3215129 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43100 |
on |
28/02/1951 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43100 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
05/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43100 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|