Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3738 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17144 Week
» 70160 Month
» 189687 Year
» 3216540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43093 |
on |
20/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
Sun 20/12/1950 to South Lynn (31D) |
Withdrawal |
Sun 17/01/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
9w/e |
08/02/1964 |
ALLOC |
41D |
Canklow |
2w/e |
31/10/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/01/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/12/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43093 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
17/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43093 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|