Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16373 Week
» 69389 Month
» 188916 Year
» 3215769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43084 |
on |
15/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
Sat 15/11/1950 to New England (35A) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 09/09/1967 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/11/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43084 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
18/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43084 |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|