Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3936 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17342 Week
» 70358 Month
» 189885 Year
» 3216738 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43077 |
on |
11/10/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50D |
Goole |
4w/e |
14/08/1965 |
ALLOC |
55D |
Royston |
4w/e |
09/10/1965 |
ALLOC |
55F |
Manningham |
8w/e |
25/02/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/04/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43077 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43077 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|