Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2045 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19848 Week
» 72864 Month
» 192391 Year
» 3219244 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43050 |
on |
31/08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sat 31/08/1950 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 09/09/1967 |
Service Life |
17 yrs , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
w/e |
24/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
51G |
Haverton Hill |
4w/e |
26/05/1956 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
ALLOC |
55F |
Manningham |
4w/e |
23/04/1966 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
20/05/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/09/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/09/1964 |
Darlington MPD (Shed) |
On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. |
SLS/196410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43050 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
24/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43050 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|