Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 455 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18258 Week
» 71274 Month
» 190801 Year
» 3217654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4246 |
m/e |
03/1916 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
2636 |
To Service |
During 03/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/11/1962 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4246 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2636 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport Pill (PILL) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F) |
|
|
13/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4246 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|