Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14116 Week
» 67132 Month
» 186659 Year
» 3213512 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4244 |
m/e |
02/1916 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7247 |
on |
08/09/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
2634 |
To Service |
During 02/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 22/03/1963 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4244 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2634 |
|
|
08/09/1938 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7247 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
22/03/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7247 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|