Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 443 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18246 Week
» 71262 Month
» 190789 Year
» 3217642 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
922 |
m/e |
04/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6620 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
46620 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3171 |
To Service |
During 04/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1953 |
Service Life |
61 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/03/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1947 |
Carmarthen |
Carmarthen-Llandilo Section (ex L.N.W.R.): No trace now exists of the old L.N.W.R. shed at Carmarthen and the site is much overgrown. Since it was closed the ex L.N.W.R. 2-4-2T's working the branch, have been housed at the G.W.R. shed, but at the week-ended 27/12 only two were allocated: Nos. 6620 an 6740. For some time the L.M.S.R. foot-plate staff have been using G.W.R. locomotives on the branch-usually the 2200 Class or Pannier Tanks from Carmarthen shed, Thus the new era has been somewhat forestalled in this area! Undoubtedly the ex L.N.W.R. locomotives will soon depart from this one-time outpost; it is interesting to recall that before 1912, L.N.W.R. 2-4-2T's had to handle the Salop-Swansea passenger trains! |
SLS/194802 |
31/03/1948 |
Swansea Area |
During Easter L.M.S. No. 6620 (4B) ex L.N.W. 2-4-2T was noted on Pontardulais 'motor' trains prior to its return to Carmarthen: the latter shed (GW) had only L.M.S. No. 6740 for the Llandilo branch but G.W. engines were also being used by L.M.S. men. On Upper Bank shed (ex M.R.) were L.M.S. No. 28543 (4B) (ex L.N.W. 18' 0-6-0), and L.M.S. No. 22907 (2D) (ex M.R. 0-6-0)-both on loan. |
SLS/194805 |
29/11/1952 |
Central Wales Line |
Freight traffic is very heavy on this line, and the line is being worked to the limit of its capacity. An interesting variety of locomotives appears on the 8.30 a.m. local passenger train, Swansea (Victoria) to Pontardulais. The favourite class is the G.W. 0-6-OPT, with the Fowler 2-6-4T a close second. Ex G.W. 0-6-2T are frequently used, while ex L.N.W. 0-8-0, 0-6-2T, and even a Stanier 2-8-0 occasionally perform. Oddly enough, Webb 2-4-2T, No. 46620, frequently seen on the 8.18 a.m. and 5.20 p.m. ex Pontardulais, seems to take a dislike to working the train. The daily freight on the Llanmorlais branch is usually worked by a Shrewsbury 4-6-0 filling in time between main line duties. |
SLS/195303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1891 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 922 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3171 |
|
|
02/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6620 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46620 |
|
|
02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46620 |
|
|
03/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|