Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1555 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14961 Week
» 67977 Month
» 187504 Year
» 3214357 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4230 |
m/e |
11/1913 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
196 |
Works Number |
2549 |
To Service |
During 11/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 27/09/1962 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 10 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4230 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2549 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
27/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4230 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|