Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1468 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14874 Week
» 67890 Month
» 187417 Year
» 3214270 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4219 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7250 |
m/e |
02/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2463 |
To Service |
During 12/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/09/1964 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4219 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2463 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glyn Neath (nea) |
|
|
02/1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7250 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
28/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7250 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|