Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 770 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19681 Week
» 84635 Month
» 287299 Year
» 3314152 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4210 |
m/e |
03/1912 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7252 |
m/e |
04/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2454 |
To Service |
During 03/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/06/1965 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4210 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2454 |
|
|
04/1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7252 |
|
|
18/05/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (SLO) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Didcot (DID) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
17/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
16/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7252 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|