Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1790 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20701 Week
» 85655 Month
» 288319 Year
» 3315172 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4206 |
m/e |
02/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2450 |
To Service |
During 02/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 31/12/1959 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 11 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83E |
St Blazey |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
General |
Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4206 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2450 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4206 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|