Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
782 |
|
02/1883 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
11457 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
51457 |
|
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
2019 |
To Service |
During 02/1883 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/03/1959 |
Service Life |
76 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1914 |
Reboilered |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 782 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 2019 |
|
|
03/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11457 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51457 |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51457 |
|
|