Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1302 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19105 Week
» 72121 Month
» 191648 Year
» 3218501 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
776 |
m/e |
07/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8611 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28611 |
m/e |
03/1943 |
British Railways |
58426 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Cauliflowers |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4168 |
To Service |
During 07/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/10/1952 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
5A |
Crewe North |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/10/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 776 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4168 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8611 |
|
|
03/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28611 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58426 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
25/10/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58426 |
|
|